Au, Anthony Soot-Wang (CPSO#: 22813)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Sydney, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony S. Au Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2009

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Au's medical records remain with: Trillium Health Centre Health Records Department 100 Queensway West Mississauga, ON L5B 1B8 Tel: (905) 848-7100
Date Received: 24 Aug 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012