Au, Bryan Lap-Yin (CPSO#: 71373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Fax: (416) 864-5341
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bryan Au Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Au ( CPSO# 71373 )

Business Address:
Emergency Department
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5095

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYAN LAP-YIN AU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002