Au, Samuel Fook Hang (CPSO#: 92791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 33554
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Anesthesia
Southlake Regional Health Center
596 David Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: 905-895-4521 Ext. 2712
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Department of Anesthesia
Lakebridge Health Ajax & Pickering
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samuel F.H. Au Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Au ( CPSO# 92791 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Unit 510
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL FOOK HANG AU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015