Austrup, Mona Louise (CPSO#: 65341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Catharines General Hospital
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 45561
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mona Austrup Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Austrup ( CPSO# 65341 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONA LOUISE AUSTRUP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTRUP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993