Averns, Henry Lloyd (CPSO#: 85851)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jan 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quarry Medical Building
Suite 301
190 Wellington Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3E4
Phone: (613) 507-7878
Fax: (613) 507-7879
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Henry Averns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Averns ( CPSO# 85851 )

Business Address:
Quarry Medical Building
Suite 301
190 Wellington
Kingston ON  K7L 3E4
Phone Number: (613) 507-7878

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Henry Lloyd Averns may practise medicine independently in rheumatology,
            only.