Avila Insambergth, Arsenio Jose (CPSO#: 53595)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Del Zulia, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook and Women's College
Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College hospital
Pain Clinic
76 Grenville St. 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6269
Fax: (416) 323-2666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Health Science North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury,
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 4733
Fax: (705) 675-4768
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Orthopaedic and Arthritic Hospital
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Canada
Phone: (416) 967-8500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kensington Screening Cancer Center
340 College Street,
Toronto ON  H5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-9511
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Spadina Spa and Pain Solutions
329 Lonsdale , Spadina corner, 2nd
Toronto ON  M4V 1X3
Canada
Phone: 6473468200
Fax: 6473468201
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arsenio Avila Insambergth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Avila Insambergth ( CPSO# 53595 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (866) 469-0822

Business Address:
Spadina Spa & Pain Solutions
329 Lonsdale Road
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5P 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 346-8200

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Department of Anesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
M300
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6269

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARSENIO JOSE AVILA INSAMBERGTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVILA INSAMBERGTH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1987