Aviv, Richard Ivan (CPSO#: 78068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7989
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.I. Aviv Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
Room AG31
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD IVAN AVIV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVIV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Apr 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Dec 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012