Avula, Balaji Narayana (CPSO#: 108424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  13 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jan 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Gulbarga University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington District Memorial
Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 322-2501
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balaji N. Avula Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Avula ( CPSO# 108424)

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-2373

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jan 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Balaji  Narayana Avula may practise GP-Anaesthesia at the Leamington
                  District  Memorial   Hospital   in   Leamington,   Ontario,  while  under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  three  years  from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Avula's knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College by  the  due  date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Avula's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is issued on January 14, 2016, and will expire  on  or
                  before January 13, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.