Awadde Alla Ghattas, Suzan (CPSO#: 76344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Tanta University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eglinton Churchill Medical Centre
Unit C3
2901 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 6J3
Phone: (905) 608-1173
Fax: (905) 608-1176
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suzan Awadde Alla Ghattas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Awadde Alla Ghattas ( CPSO# 76344 )

Business Address:
Eglinton Churchill Medical Centre
C3 - 2901 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 6J3
Phone Number: (905) 608-1173

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZAN AWADDE ALLA GHATTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWADDE ALLA GHATTAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003