Awuku, Mark Addi (CPSO#: 50101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SUITE 348
600 Tecumseh Street East
Windsor ON  N8X 4X9
Phone: (519) 252-6464
Fax: (519) 252-9303
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Awuku Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Awuku ( CPSO# 50101 )

Business Address:
348 - 600 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 252-6464

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ADDI AWUKU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWUKU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1988