Ayad, Misaa Mustafa Sabri (CPSO#: 72068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wilson Medical Centre
130 Wilson Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1E2
Phone: (905) 526-6250
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ayad ( CPSO# 72068 )

Business Address:
Wilson Medical Centre
130 Wilson Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1E2
Phone Number: (905) 526-6250

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Aug 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MISAA MUSTAFA SABRI AYAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 01 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 02 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 13 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 14 Aug 2000 to 13 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 14 Aug 2001 to 13 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004