Aye, Tim Maung (CPSO#: 64265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Aye ( CPSO# 64265 )

Business Address:
St Marys General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIM MAUNG AYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992