Ayeni, Olubimpe (CPSO#: 84534)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Suite 101
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-6644
Fax: (905) 853-1898
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Olubimpe Ayeni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ayeni ( CPSO# 84534 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
581 Davis Drive
Suite 101
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 853-6644

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLUBIMPE AYENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYENI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2011