Azadeh, Minoo (CPSO#: 87289)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, Farsi, French

Education:Tabriz University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 748-2929
Fax: (416) 748-8582
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2221 keele street, suite 209
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (416) 249-4255
Fax: (416) 249-4791
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1849 Yonge Street, suite 705
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (416) 481-4433
Fax: (416) 481-7011
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

8800 Dufferin st, suite105
Vaughan ON  L4K 0C5
Canada
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Minoo Azadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Azadeh ( CPSO# 87289 )

Business Address:
400 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 748-2929

Business Address:
7 Elmwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M2N 6R6
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Business Address:
705 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 481-4433

Business Address:
209 - 2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 249-4255

Business Address:
Unit C2
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 0K2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINOO AZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZADEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2012