Azi, Adaku Michelle (CPSO#: 85300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Igbo

Education:ABIA STATE UNIVERSITY, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2101 - 222 King Street E
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 440-3600 Ext. 2
Fax: (905) 697-7745
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON  L1G2B9
Canada
Phone: 9055768711 Ext. 3931
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. M. Azi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Azi ( CPSO# 85300 )

Business Address:
Bomanville Medical Building
2101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 440-3600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAKU MICHELLE AZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2008