Azzola, Alescia Linda (CPSO#: 97669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone: 705-675-2388
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alescia Linda Azzola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Azzola ( CPSO# 97669 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Endocrinology Department
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALESCIA LINDA AZZOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZZOLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2016