Baass, Patricia Caroline (CPSO#: 75012)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
240 Warncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone: (519) 685-3210
Fax: (519) 685-1432
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia Baass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Baass ( CPSO# 75012 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone Number: (519) 685-3210

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA CAROLINE BAASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAASS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002