Babay, Hichem (CPSO#: 30248)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Italian

Education:University of Tours, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hichem Babay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 9 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 19 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 May 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jan 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 25, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Babay was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of sexual abuse and disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct. While these allegations were outstanding, Dr. Babay resigned from the College effective January 25, 2012, and agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.