Baboolal, Ranjit Terence (CPSO#: 58720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 707
1265 Arthur Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone: (807) 622-6366
Fax: (807) 622-1078
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ranjit T. Baboolal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Baboolal ( CPSO# 58720 )

Business Address:
Suite 707
1265 Arthur Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone Number: (807) 622-6366

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANJIT TERENCE BABOOLAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABOOLAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990