Bach, Tammy Vu (CPSO#: 102068)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tammy Vu Bach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2017