Bacon, Mark John (CPSO#: 69068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LaSalle Community Healthcare Clinic
2125 Front Road
La Salle ON  N9J 2C1
Phone: (519) 734-1234
Fax: (519) 734-8674
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Bacon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bacon ( CPSO# 69068 )

Business Address:
2125 Front Road
La Salle ON  N9J 2C1
Phone Number: (519) 734-1234

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JOHN BACON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1998