Baghdadlian, Hovsep (CPSO#: 60032)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 913-7224
Fax: (416) 913-6286
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hovsep Baghdadlian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 10 2008


Corporation Name: Hovsep Baghdadlian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Baghdadlian ( CPSO# 60032 )

Business Address:
Suite 406
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 913-7224

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 08 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOVSEP BAGHDADLIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGHDADLIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988