Bagovich, Maria Ana (CPSO#: 88488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
100 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: 416 745 5557
Fax: 416 745 1990
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maria Bagovich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bagovich ( CPSO# 88488 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
100 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 745-5557

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA ANA BAGOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGOVICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012