Baier, Paul Adolf (CPSO#: 74702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Ext. 4135
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul A. Baier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Baier ( CPSO# 74702 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Business Address:
Weeneebayko General Hospital
P.O. Box 34
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL ADOLF BAIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005