Bailey, Christopher Stewart (CPSO#: 70072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Room E1 317
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8055
Fax: (519) 685-8059
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Bailey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bailey ( CPSO# 70072 )

Business Address:
Room E1 317
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER STEWART BAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2005