Baimel, Evelyne (CPSO#: 32281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 1981

Summary

Former Name: Bensmihen-Baimel, Evelyne (used until: 27 Mar 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1835 Yonge Street
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Phone: (416) 487-0347
Fax: (416) 481-6949
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evelyne Baimel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Baimel ( CPSO# 32281 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
1835 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 487-0291

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVELYNE BAIMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIMEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1981