Bain, Douglas James (CPSO#: 59520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
The Chest Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-7777
Fax: (416) 469-7717
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas Bain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bain ( CPSO# 59520 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
The Respiratory Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JAMES BAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1992