Baird, Judy Lynn (CPSO#: 66870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Shaver Health &
Rehabilitation Centre
541 Glenridge Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone: 905 685-1381
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burke Baird Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baird ( CPSO# 67841 )
Dr. J. Baird ( CPSO# 66870 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Child Advocacy and Assessment Program
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDY LYNN BAIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIRD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995