Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bajwa, Gurjit Singh (CPSO#: 70492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Etobicoke General Hospital
William Osler Health Systems
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bajwa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bajwa ( CPSO# 70492 )

Business Address:
Suite 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6N5
Phone Number: (416) 741-2273

Business Address:
1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Phone Number: (416) 741-2273

Business Address:
Suite 8
51 Mountainash Road
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 741-2273

Business Address:
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone Number: (905) 672-2273

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Etobicoke Hospital Campus
William Osler Health Centre
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURJIT SINGH BAJWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJWA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1998