Baker, James Edward (CPSO#: 68849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Anesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416 993 4062
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James E. Baker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baker ( CPSO# 68849 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department Of Anesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5072

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES EDWARD BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003