Baker, Kevin Robert (CPSO#: 54419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sound Care Medical &
Imaging Centre
Suite 560
1145 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Phone: (613) 738-2378
Fax: (613) 738-2653
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin R. Baker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Baker ( CPSO# 54419 )

Business Address:
Sound Care Medical & Imaging Centre
Suite 560
1145 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Phone Number: (613) 738-2378

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN ROBERT BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1988