Baker, Robert Stanley (CPSO#: 19061)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Baker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: McLean Clinic 50 Burnhamthorpe Road West Mississauga, ON L5B 3C2
Date Received: 15 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2015