Balcewicz, Malgorzata (CPSO#: 78243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Pomeranian Academy of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WOHC Brampton Civic Hospital
Oncology Department
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6542
Fax: (905) 494-6416
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Rolling Hills Dr.
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-2410
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

1A Conestoga Drive # 200
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Canada
Phone: 416 4761756
Fax: 289 7524335
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balcewicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Balcewicz ( CPSO# 78243 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
1A Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6542

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALGORZATA BALCEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALCEWICZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2003