Balki, Mrinalini (CPSO#: 75922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Aug 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Balki, Mrinalini Sunil (used until: 04 Aug 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Nagpur University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue, Room 19-104
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: (416) 586-8664
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M Balki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Balki ( CPSO# 75922 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Room 19-104
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3111

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 12 Aug 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2001 to 11 Mar 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2002 to 11 Mar 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2003 to 12 Mar 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Aug 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Mrinalini Balki may practise medicine only,

                  (a)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr. Balki holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (b)   in accordance with the requirement of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when  Dr. Balki no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.