Ball, Ian Charles (CPSO#: 50111)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian C. Ball Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 7 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2014