Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Banik, Tapan Kanti (CPSO#: 60004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Calcutta, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Room NI 423
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 57701
Fax: (905) 494-6710
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Banik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Banik ( CPSO# 60004 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
Mental Health Unit
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Room N 1 423
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAPAN KANTI BANIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1988