Banoub, Tahany Darwish (CPSO#: 63094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1550
Fax: (905) 813-4502
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

406-2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 267-1005 Ext. 2204
Fax: (905) 997-4463
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.D. Banoub Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Banoub ( CPSO# 63094 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Aug 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAHANY DARWISH BANOUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANOUB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 10 Aug 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996