Baqi, Sitwat Mahin (CPSO#: 64981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
100 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: (416) 742-6377
Fax: (416) 742-2139
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahin Baqi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Baqi ( CPSO# 64981 )

Business Address:
Unit 302
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 742-6377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SITWAT MAHIN BAQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAQI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993