Barbera, Lisa Catherine (CPSO#: 68984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4806
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa C. Barbera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Barbera ( CPSO# 68984 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA CATHERINE BARBERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBERA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000