Bard, Vitaly (CPSO#: 66517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2207 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1X1
Phone: (905) 820-3633
Fax: (905) 820-3352
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bard Moffat Woolfson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2017


Corporation Name: Vitaly Bard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bard ( CPSO# 66517 )

Business Address:
2207 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1X1
Phone Number: (905) 820-3633

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VITALY BARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998