Bargman, Joanne Miriam (CPSO#: 43099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Room 8N - 840
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4804
Fax: (416) 340-4999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne Bargman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Silverman ( CPSO# 43100 )
Dr. J. Bargman ( CPSO# 43099 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
8N-840 North (Norman Urquhart) Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4804

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE MIRIAM BARGMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARGMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1985