Bariana, Sam Singh (CPSO#: 86010)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 116
284 Queen St., East
Brampton ON  L6V1C2
Phone: (905) 463-2095
Fax: (905) 463-2096
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

15 Brenda Boulevard
Suite 12
Orangeville
Orangeville ON  L9W 3Y5
Canada
Phone: (519) 307-2095
Fax: (519) 942-9504
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Bariana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bariana ( CPSO# 86010 )

Business Address:
Suite 116
284 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone Number: (905) 463-2095

Business Address:
12 - 15 Brenda Avenue
Orangeville ON  L9W 3Y5
Phone Number: (519) 307-2095

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jan 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAM SINGH BARIANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARIANA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2009