Barnett, Carmen Elyse (CPSO#: 86235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite LL 4
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 503-3005
Fax: (705) 737-2842
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carmen E. Barnett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Barnett ( CPSO# 86235 )

Business Address:
Suite LL 4
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L7M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 503-3005

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARMEN ELYSE BARNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012