Barnett, John Richard (CPSO#: 22546)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Otago, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Richard Barnett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Nov 2012