Barnfield, Paul Christopher (CPSO#: 95689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cance Centre
J Wing, Room 3-75
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9711 Ext. 63123
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brant Community Cancer Clinic
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: (519) 751-5585
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul C. Barnfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Barnfield ( CPSO# 95689 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
J Wing Room 3-75
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9711

Business Address:
Brant Community Cancer Clinic
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL CHRISTOPHER BARNFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNFIELD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2015