Barrie, Gordon (CPSO#: 24293)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Barrie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 10 Delisle Ave Suite 713 Toronto, ON M4V 3C6
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2017