Barton, Guy John (CPSO#: 21535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
Xray Department
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4300 Ext. 4937
Fax: (905) 721-3560
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.J. Barton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Barton ( CPSO# 21535 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4937

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUY JOHN BARTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Oct 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1975