Barton, Michele Christina (CPSO#: 58020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 May 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
475 Granville Street
Suite 101
Summerside PE  C1N 3N9
Phone: (902)432-8181
Fax: (902) 436-9660
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Prince County Hospital
P O Box 3000
65 Roy Boates Avenue
Summerside PE  C1N 2A9
Canada
Phone: (902) 438-4200
Fax: (902) 438-4511
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michele C. Barton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 5 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Sep 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE CHRISTINA BARTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1989