Bastien, Pascal (CPSO#: 88383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Division of General Internal Med
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (647) 494-8768
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bastien Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bastien ( CPSO# 88383 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Division of General Internal Med
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PASCAL BASTIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASTIEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012