Battel, Luigi Anthony (CPSO#: 65342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centennial Family Physicians
Suite 200
2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone: (613) 546-6652
Fax: (613) 344-1365
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luigi A. Battel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Battel ( CPSO# 65342 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone Number: (613) 546-6652

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUIGI ANTHONY BATTEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATTEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993